Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the penalties for voluntarily causing physical injury to bus, train, or light rail operators or any other individuals providing public transportation services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0683 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:49 PM
Click to return on the top page