Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Regional Higher Education Center - Charles County
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland to adopt a plan on or before July 1, 2023, to establish a regional higher education center in Charles County to provide students in Charles County with access to established, cutting-edge, and high-demand academic programs of degree-granting institutions; and requiring the Board of Regents to implement the plan to establish a regional higher education center in Charles County on or before July 1, 2028.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Regional Higher Education Center - Charles County
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   12-124 )
Last Updated: 2/10/2022 4:01 PM
Click to return on the top page