Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 120 to 240, the number of required days for a certain mandatory education program for correctional institutions in the Division of Correction.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0070 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Judiciary 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text - Chapter - Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:19 PM
Click to return on the top page