Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Certified Nursing Assistants - Licensing Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certified nursing assistant to meet certain federal requirements and pass a competency exam on or after October 1, 2023; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a program to assist certified nursing assistants in meeting licensing requirements established by the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/17/2021
Legislative Date
8/17/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Certified Nursing Assistants - Licensing Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/17/2021 8/17/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Certified Nursing Assistants - Licensing Requirements
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/21/2022 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page