Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing charter counties to provide for the enforcement of local building energy performance laws by imposing civil fines not exceeding $10 per square foot of gross floor area; and providing that a civil fine may be imposed under the Act only if construction on the building was completed at least 3 years and 1 day before the date the civil fine would be imposed.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0061
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {233826/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/31/2022 9:22 AM
Click to return on the top page