Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts and Low Speed Vehicles - Cobb Island
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing exceptions to motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts and low speed vehicles on Cobb Island, Charles County; requiring an operator of a golf cart on a highway on Cobb Island without a certain registration to operate the golf cart only on a highway with a maximum posted speed limit of 30 miles per hour and between dawn and dusk; requiring the vehicle be equipped with certain lighting devices and be kept to the far right of the roadway; and requiring the operator to possess a valid driver's license.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts and Low Speed Vehicles - Cobb Island
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts and Low Speed Vehicles - Cobb Island
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2022 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page