Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Standing Committee on Rules of Practice and Procedure
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering and adding provisions of law governing the members of the Standing Committee on Rules of Practice and Procedure of the Court of Appeals, including provisions relating to removal of members from the committee, representation, compensation, and public disclosure of certain interests.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Standing Committee on Rules of Practice and Procedure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Standing Committee on Rules of Practice and Procedure
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page