Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Security Management within the Department of Information Technology, certain Office positions, and the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council; requiring, by December 1 each year, each unit of the Legislative or Judicial Branch of State government, each unit of local government, and any local agencies that use a certain network to certify to the Department that the unit is in compliance with the Department's minimum security standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0879
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1036 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554834/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {826585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Reilly)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Reilly)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Rosenberg, Johnson and Hill)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Rosenberg, Johnson and Hill)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {243326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {554834/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {826585/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Reilly) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Reilly) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Refuses Recede 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Rosenberg, Johnson and Hill) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 House Refuses Recede 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Rosenberg, Johnson and Hill) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Conference Committee Report {243326/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-107,   3.5-101, 3.5-2A-01 through 3.5-2A-05, 3.5-301, 3.5-302, 3.5-303, 3.5-307, 3.5-309, 3.5-311, 3.5-404, 3.5-405, 3A-101 through 3A-702   )
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page