Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems) and Senators Carozza, Gallion, Hester, Kagan, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a paramedic to administer certain immunizations and skin testing to certain ambulance service personnel under certain circumstances; authorizing a paramedic to administer influenza and 2019CoV immunizations if the immunizations are under the direction of a certain physician and authorized by the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, part of a certain outreach effort, and provided in accordance with a certain written agreement; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1313
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766381/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-5)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {766381/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-5) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Last Updated: 5/3/2021 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page