Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring - Education Requirements (Give Me A Chance - Job Opportunities Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from developing or implementing an application or hiring process that uses an applicant's or employee's lack of achievement of a certain level of education in employment decisions unless a minimum educational qualification is required to obtain an occupational license; authorizing an employer to inquire as to an applicant's academic achievement after an initial offer of employment, but may not rescind the offer based on the applicant's response; providing certain penalties under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0191 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Hiring - Education Requirements (Give Me A Chance - Job Opportunities Act of 2022)
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page