Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to waive the charging of unemployment insurance benefits paid to a claimant during the state of emergency declared by the Governor due to the COVID-19 pandemic against the earned rating record of an employing unit; specifying the circumstances under which the required waiver of benefit charges is no longer in effect; and terminating the Act 1 year from the date on which the state of emergency declared by the Governor due to the COVID-19 pandemic ends.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/19/2021 12:37 PM
Click to return on the top page