Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide certain safety and workforce development training for its operations training workforce and its maintenance workforce; requiring the Administration's annual report on the implementation of the conversion of the State's transit bus fleet to zero-emission buses to include a plan that ensures certain employee protections and a certification that the Administration is adhering to the plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0010
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page