Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Baltimore County Board of Education to retain counsel to represent it in legal matters affecting the Board and to contract for the payment of a reasonable fee to the counsel.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2021
Legislative Date
9/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-13)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2021 9/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (119-13) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:05 PM
Click to return on the top page