Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Kelley)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program established by a county or municipality to include loans to certain residential and commercial property owners to finance grid resilience projects when installed with energy efficiency projects or renewable energy projects; and requiring a certain ordinance or resolution that establishes a certain clean energy loan program to include certain eligibility requirements for certain grid resilience projects.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167070/1
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167070/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {167070/1 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {167070/1 (Finance Committee) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page