Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain notices and information regarding applications to the federal Low-Income Housing Tax Credit Program, the Rental Housing Program, the Partnership Rental Housing Program, the Community Legacy Program, the Neighborhood Business Development Program, and the Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program within the Department of Housing and Community Development to be provided to members of the General Assembly representing the district in which certain proposed projects are located.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/30/2021
Legislative Date
8/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/30/2021 8/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Housing Development and Neighborhood Revitalization Programs – Notice and Application Requirements
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {853525/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/4/2022 10:39 AM
Click to return on the top page