Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from employing an individual as a police officer unless the individual has undergone and achieved a satisfactory result on a certain psychological screening; requiring that a police officer who has been convicted of killing or causing a debilitating injury against another person be terminated from employment; requiring a police officer to receive certain training every 3 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page