Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to execute an electronic will or remotely witnessed will without a notary public if the supervising attorney creates a certified will that contains a certain form attached or annexed to the will; prohibiting a supervising attorney from being a witness to an electronic will or remotely witnessed will if the will is executed without a notary public; and authorizing a notary public located in the State to perform a notarial act using communication technology for a remotely located individual for a trust instrument.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0576
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Text - Chapter - Wills and Trust Instruments – Electronic Execution
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page