Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and County Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program Participation Goals
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in consultation with the Secretary of Transportation and the Attorney General, to establish a certain overall percentage participation goal for certain minority business enterprises; requiring the Special Secretary to consider certain information when establishing the goal; requiring each unit of State government to structure procurement procedures in a certain manner to try to achieve a certain goal; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State and County Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program Participation Goals
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   14-301, 14-302, 14-303 )
(   2012, 2013, 2017 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page