Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council to be the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias Council; establishing 3-year terms for the appointed members of the Council; requiring the Council, by September 1, 2022, and by September 1 every 5 years thereafter, to issue and publish an update to the State Plan on Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias; establishing the position of Director of Dementia Services and Brain Health to facilitate communication relating to dementia services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0166
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {933021/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273726/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text - Chapter - Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
(   2013, 2016, 2019 )
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page