Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to collect litter and mow the grass along State highways and certain interstate highways on a consistent and regular basis; requiring the Administration to seasonally adjust the frequency with which litter collection and mowing occurs, subject to certain requirements; requiring the Administration to contract with a Maryland-based company to collect litter and provide mowing services under the Act; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8-609.4 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page