Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a defendant, on conviction of a certain crime, to file a motion requesting that the court consider the defendant's status as the primary caretaker of a child or vulnerable adult in determining the sentence for the crime; and establishing procedures for filing a motion, granting a motion, sentencing, and modifying a sentence under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0337
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page