Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of Injectable Medications for Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining "injectable medications for treatment of sexually transmitted infections" for purposes of authorizing pharmacists to administer the medications; and requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide certain coverage for the administration of the medication by a pharmacist.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0229
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-3)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pharmacists – Administration of Maintenance Injectable Medications – Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists – Administration of Maintenance Injectable Medications – Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {313920/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-3) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacists - Administration of Injectable Medications for Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page