Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Judiciary, in consultation with domestic violence and child abuse organizations, to develop and update as appropriate a training program for judges and magistrates presiding over child custody cases involving child abuse or domestic violence; requiring the training program to include certain subject matter; and requiring the Maryland Judiciary to adopt procedures to ensure that only judges who have received certain training are assigned child custody cases that may involve child abuse or domestic violence.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0561
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0675 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {993923/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Judiciary 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683525/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text - Chapter - Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges
(   9-101.3 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page