Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza and West
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing a life-threatening injury to another as a result of the person's driving, operating, or controlling a motor vehicle or vessel in a criminally negligent manner; exempting certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 1 year or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both for a violation of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0855
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {132812/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {132812/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
(   3-212.1 )
Last Updated: 5/3/2021 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page