Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 3 to 4 years after an offense was committed, the statute of limitations for certain prosecutions related to violations of State election laws; imposing certain restrictions related to candidacies, political committee positions, and elected offices if a certain civil penalty has not been paid; altering enforcement mechanisms related to violations of State campaign finance laws, including the amount of certain civil penalties, and the manner for imposing certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0340
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2021
Legislative Date
9/22/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {143921/1 (Senator Cassilly)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {143921/1 (Senator Cassilly)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {143921/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-28)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {803728/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-35)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2021 9/22/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Floor Amendment {143921/1 (Senator Cassilly) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Floor Amendment {143921/1 (Senator Cassilly) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Hough) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Floor Amendment {143921/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-28) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Floor Amendment {803728/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Ways and Means Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {113922/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-35) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page