Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Maryland Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Sustainable Maryland Program; establishing the Sustainable Maryland Program Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to expand and enhance Sustainable Maryland's promotion and support of communities in Maryland in the effort to realize environmental, economic, and social sustainability; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; requiring the Governor, in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter, to provide an appropriation of $500,000 to the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0100
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/23/2021
Legislative Date
7/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Sustainable Maryland Program and Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/23/2021 7/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Appropriations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543427/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sustainable Maryland Program and Fund - Establishment
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
(   13-105 )
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:19 PM
Click to return on the top page