Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Carter, Cassilly, Hettleman, Jackson, Lee, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial and Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay certain compensation in a certain manner to a certain individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and subsequently confined for a felony on receipt of a certain order; authorizing an administrative law judge to issue a certain order of eligibility; authorizing a certain individual who has previously received compensation to request an order for supplemental compensation in certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0742
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial and Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {228478/1 Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Racial and Equity Impact Note
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text - Chapter - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Last Updated: 4/20/2021 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page