Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the formula under which the Vehicle Theft Prevention Council allocates grants from the Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund by providing that, to the extent practicable, the Council shall consider allocating the grants among the subdivisions of the State on a pro rata basis determined by the total number of vehicles stolen in each subdivision divided by the total number of vehicles stolen in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/30/2021
Legislative Date
8/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/30/2021 8/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553323/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Theft Prevention Fund – Allocation of Grants
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Judiciary 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page