Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Augustine, Beidle, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Kagan, Kelley, Ready, Washington, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the health care services the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, is required to provide through telehealth; requiring that certain services provided under the Program include certain counseling and treatment; prohibiting the Program from excluding from coverage a behavioral health care service provided to a recipient in person solely because the service may be provided through telehealth; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to submit a certain report on telehealth; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0123
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377177/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {946780/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {377177/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {946780/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text - Chapter - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page