Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Augustine, Feldman, Kelley, and Kramer
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order for each work site where the Commissioner has made an initial determination that a contractor or subcontractor may have violated the prevailing wage requirements; requiring a prompt investigation of compliance with certain wage requirements if a complaint of a violation is received or a violation is made known; authorizing the Commissioner to impose a penalty of up to $5,000 for each day a stop work order is violated; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0145
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2021
Legislative Date
9/24/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-34)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Overridden (97-41)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2021 9/24/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493721/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Economic Matters 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703428/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-34) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Post Passage 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Overridden (31-15) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Overridden (97-41) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Text - Chapter - State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page