Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Pena-Melnyk, Luedtke, and Buckel
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating that the State of Maryland stands in solidarity with the government and people of Ukraine as they resist the unprovoked invasion of their territory by the Russian Federation.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0011
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Benson) Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Rules 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Benson) Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Text - Chapter - Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/18/2022 5:07 PM
Click to return on the top page