Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and engage in certain other activities related to collective bargaining.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Wells) Adopted (121-11)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2022 3/05/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Wells) Adopted (121-11) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
(   28-1 through 28-8 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page