Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Amprey, Anderton, Atterbeary, Beitzel, Belcastro, Bhandari, Boyce, Bridges, Brooks, Buckel, Charkoudian, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Foley, Forbes, Guyton, Healey, Hill, Jackson, Jalisi, D. Jones, R. Jones, J. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Rogers, Ruth, Shoemaker, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Szeliga, Terrasa, Thiam, Toles, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Wells, Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to review investment holdings in eligible accounts to determine the extent to which these funds are invested in Russia-restricted investments; requiring the Board of Trustees to take certain divestment actions; prohibiting the Board of Trustees from making certain new investments; providing certain immunities from liability for certain persons; requiring the Board of Trustees to act in good faith in taking certain actions in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1005
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Lierman) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Lierman) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {523423/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (45-87)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Lierman) Adopted (135-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Lierman) Adopted (135-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Appropriations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {523423/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (45-87) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page