Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Adams
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Talbot County in the event Talbot County becomes a participating governmental unit in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; and providing that certain local detention center officers who join the Correctional Officers' Retirement System and receive certain service credit shall no longer be members of the Employees' Pension System and shall have no further rights to any benefit in that Employees' Pension System.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0997
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Talbot County
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2022 4/03/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/03/2022 4/03/2022 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page