Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that part-time physicians and physician assistants are eligible for participation in the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to establish prorated loan repayment assistance for part-time physicians and physician assistants; and establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program Advisory Council for Physicians and Physician Assistants to assist the Department in the administration of the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0626
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-1)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {403722/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-1) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text - Chapter - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page