Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Workforce Development Programs – Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include a $5,000,000 appropriation in fiscal year 2024 to the Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center; and requiring the Center to use the funding to establish or support workforce development programs at the Center.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323927/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-25)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Workforce Development Programs – Funding
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {323927/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Workforce Development Programs – Funding
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (107-25) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {123226/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Workforce Development Programs – Funding
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Text - Chapter - Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Workforce Development Programs – Funding
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page