Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirements - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of each county to appropriate a certain amount of funds to the school operating budgets for fiscal year 2023.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0640
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirements - Alterations
House 3/29/2022 3/30/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page