Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – National Center for Victims of Crime – Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor in fiscal years 2024 through 2026 to include an appropriation of $750,000 in the annual budget bill to the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to be used as an operating grant to the National Center for Victims of Crime to create and enhance services to victims of crime in Prince George's County; and requiring the Office by December 15, 2026 to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on the effectiveness of the use of the funds.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George’s County – National Center for Victims of Crime – Funding
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-1011 )
Last Updated: 3/12/2022 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page