Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program within the Department of Commerce; authorizing certain individuals and corporations to receive a grant equal to 25% of the qualified capital expenses incurred in connection with establishing new wineries and vineyards or completing capital improvements at existing wineries and vineyards; requiring the Governor each year to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $1,000,000 to be used for grants under the Program; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0594
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2022 3/12/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-1901 through 5-1903 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page