Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to design a course of training in the pedagogy of virtual education for teacher preparation programs; requiring the State Department of Education to provide guidance to local school systems for professional development and support of certain persons to achieve certain virtual education best practice principles; establishing the Flip the Classroom Pilot Program to develop best practices related to inverted classroom and blended instructional models; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105765/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {285469/1 (Delegate Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
House 3/10/2021 3/11/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {105765/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {285469/1 (Delegate Washington) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Referred Rules 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 5/18/2021 10:02 AM
Click to return on the top page