Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the laws with which certain regulations adopted by the Maryland Health Care Commission must comply; requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Commission require the State-designated health information exchange to develop and maintain a certain consent management application, subject to certain laws, and provide for certain penalties; requiring that, subject to certain laws, certain regulations allow certain entities to use electronic health information for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {276984/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments {276984/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Referred Rules 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Returned Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page