Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Prettyman, Ruth, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services, with the advice of the Secretary of Health, to update certain minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services to reflect certain practices and guidelines; establishing the Correctional Facilities Health and Wellness Pilot Program to establish minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services in facilities participating in the Program; and requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt health and wellness standards for certain facilities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Last Updated: 3/10/2022 4:29 PM
Click to return on the top page