Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Health, with the consent of a unit of local government, to delegate to the unit of local government the authority to inspect and to conduct site visits and full surveys of related institutions and nursing homes; and requiring related institutions and nursing homes to report certain information to a unit of local government if the Secretary has delegated inspection authority.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page