Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Bhandari
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders; and requiring the Workgroup to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by May 1, 2023 on its policy recommendations for improving the use of Extreme Risk Protective Orders in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act)
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/11/2022 12:01 PM
Click to return on the top page