Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; approving the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland in a total principal amount of $25,000,000 for financing the projects; and providing that the bonds issued under the authority of the Act are not a debt or obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Rules 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page