Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from October 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, the effective date for certain provisions of law that would revise the schedule of basic child support obligations used to calculate the amount of a child support award and make other changes relating to the application of the Maryland Child Support Guidelines.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support - Guidelines
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Child Support - Guidelines
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support - Guidelines
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:29 PM
Click to return on the top page