Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipal corporation to adopt certain policies to advance progress of infrastructure, equipment, and systems needed to extend broadband access to underserved areas; requiring the Department of Transportation and units of local government to allow joint trenching by broadband providers in a certain manner under certain circumstances; exempting counties and municipal corporations within the jurisdiction of the Washington Suburban Sanitary District from certain requirements; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0824
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913598/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-28)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {913598/1 Adopted 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (107-28) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Referred Rules 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Returned Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text - Chapter - Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Last Updated: 7/6/2021 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page