Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari, Lehman, and Luedtke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to study and make recommendations regarding the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students and instructional services and transition plans for students in the program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0914 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513526/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513526/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text - Chapter - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/2/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page