Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting Baltimore City from certain requirements relating to county property tax rates; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to set special property tax rates, under certain circumstances, for any class or subclass of real property that is subject to the county property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1096 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page