Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Howard
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, for purposes of unemployment insurance law, a certain employing unit to elect to delay submitting a contribution and employment report for calendar quarters ending on March 31, 2021, and March 31, 2022; altering the application of a certain sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain clothing or footwear during a certain sales-tax free period; establishing in calendar year 2021 an 8-day tax free period from the third Sunday in September through the following Sunday for certain restaurant sales of $40 or less; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
(   10-751, 11-105,   11-228,   11-241 through 11-243 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page